U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griffin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 27, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • October 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • October 15, 2021: [Information - Felony]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 31, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 31, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 21, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 09, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 06, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 06, 2017: [Bond]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 03, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • October 03, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.