U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Edwards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 16, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Waiver]
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 10, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 04, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • October 04, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.