U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roumain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2017: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • October 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 04, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 03, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 03, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.