U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bosarge-Mendez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • May 11, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 05, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 26, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
  • January 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 17, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2017: [Bond]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 10, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Waiver]
  • October 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 10, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 10, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.