U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:03-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 12, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 05, 2017: [Remark]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 04, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 04, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 13, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 23, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 16, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 11, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 11, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.