U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guyton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 24, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Attachment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.