U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abram
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 26, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 07, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 05, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 15, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 15, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Rule 20 - Transfer In]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.