U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:94-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yarbough et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.