U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Change of Address]
  • April 07, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • June 02, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
  • October 17, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 09, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 23, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • September 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • August 14, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 18, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Reply to Response]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Affidavit]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 28, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 19, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 09, 2018: [Change of Address]
  • October 09, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • October 05, 2018: [Remark]
  • October 05, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Letter]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Letter]
  • June 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 06, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 31, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 08, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 25, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • January 11, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • January 11, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 01, 2017: [Bill of Particulars]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 06, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 03, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 24, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 18, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.