U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rutledge, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • November 09, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Remark]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Response to Order]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 10, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • January 08, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • January 07, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • January 04, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • January 04, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 28, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Reconsideration]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • September 26, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 26, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 18, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Response]
  • August 14, 2020: [Response]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Discovery]
  • July 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • May 29, 2019: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • November 09, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 08, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 31, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 24, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 22, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • August 15, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 10, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 01, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
February, 2018
  • February 19, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • February 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 16, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 12, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 20, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 05, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • December 05, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 05, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • December 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 24, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 18, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.