U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 19, 2018: [Dismiss]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 09, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • November 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 31, 2017: [Bond]
  • October 31, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 31, 2017: [Waiver]
  • October 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 24, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 18, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.