U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 05, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 29, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • March 11, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • July 28, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 14, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 13, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 08, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 06, 2020: [Reconsideration]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 26, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Reply to Response]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 18, 2020: [Attachment]
  • May 11, 2020: [Attachment]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 17, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 04, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 19, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Remark]
  • August 12, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment - 2255]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 15, 2019: [Expedite]
  • July 08, 2019: [Reply to Response]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 12, 2019: [Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 17, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 08, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • February 15, 2019: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • February 11, 2019: [Remark]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 01, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 01, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 01, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 25, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 02, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 25, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 14, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • March 09, 2018: [Revoke]
  • March 08, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 05, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 22, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 26, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 25, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 25, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 25, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 21, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • November 09, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • November 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 31, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 18, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.