U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • March 30, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 01, 2019: [Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 18, 2019: [Docket Call]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 29, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • May 20, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sealed Transcript]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 06, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • February 27, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 25, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • February 15, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 14, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • February 13, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • February 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 08, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 06, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Sealed Transcript]
  • January 31, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • January 29, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 08, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 06, 2018: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • November 06, 2018: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 06, 2018: [Jury Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 07, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 16, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 14, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2018: [Jury Selection]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • June 22, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 20, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 20, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • June 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 12, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Discovery Hearing]
  • April 02, 2018: [Reply to Response]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 13, 2018: [Compel]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2017: [Docket Call]
  • December 13, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 04, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Waiver]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 08, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 19, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • October 19, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.