U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2018: [Response]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Letter]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 09, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 09, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 09, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 29, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • October 19, 2017: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.