U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00119-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Rodriguez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 13, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Remark]
  • November 20, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • July 12, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • January 10, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 04, 2018: [Reply to Response]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 18, 2017: [Hearing]
  • December 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2017: [Docket Call]
  • December 07, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 01, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 31, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 31, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 19, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • October 19, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 18, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • October 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Waiver]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.