U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 30, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2025: [Jury Selection]
  • April 29, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 23, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Review of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sever Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [In Limine]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2024
  • December 01, 2024: [Transcript - Redacted]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 04, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 27, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 27, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • October 24, 2017: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.