U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mahone et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Response to Order]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2020
  • September 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • August 20, 2020: [Produce]
  • August 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 20, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 19, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 07, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 04, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 07, 2018: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 07, 2018: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • May 07, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2018: [Jury Trial]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 26, 2018: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 26, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • April 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 10, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 04, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • April 04, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 21, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 20, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 18, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • December 18, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 14, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 14, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 07, 2017: [Unseal Case]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 28, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2017: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 08, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • November 08, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.