U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oliver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 28, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 22, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 13, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 09, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 05, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 08, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • November 08, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.