U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phillips
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 26, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 25, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • March 18, 2021: [Response]
  • March 17, 2021: [Response]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Status Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Status Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Medical Exam]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • January 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2019: [Compel]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 13, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2017: [Docket Call]
  • December 11, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 06, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 16, 2017: [Waiver]
  • November 16, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 08, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • November 08, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.