U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shaw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 25, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 25, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 05, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Docket Call]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 16, 2017: [Waiver]
  • November 16, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 08, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • November 08, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.