U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stabler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • November 28, 2022: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 14, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • February 06, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 05, 2022: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • January 05, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 30, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 22, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 08, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Psychiatric Report]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Restricted Document]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • March 05, 2020: [Psychiatric Exam]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • September 26, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 17, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • September 17, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • September 09, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 16, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • July 02, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 25, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 25, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 24, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 08, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • November 08, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.