U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fort
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Remark]
  • January 20, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 05, 2020: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Remark]
  • October 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.