U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medrano-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 14, 2020: [Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • November 13, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • April 20, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • April 16, 2020: [Response]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • March 19, 2019: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • June 22, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 07, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 08, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 08, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 01, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 20, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 20, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 13, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 13, 2018: [Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 11, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 13, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 09, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • November 09, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.