U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 21, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 08, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 13, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 09, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • November 09, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.