U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rayo-Dominguez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 05, 2018: [Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 31, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 31, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • February 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 02, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 25, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 17, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 16, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 13, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 09, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • November 09, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.