U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jarvis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 14, 2021: [Release of Funds]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Reply to Response]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2019: [Compel]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 28, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 28, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 08, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 21, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 04, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 04, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 01, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2018: [Suppress]
  • April 27, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 08, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 13, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 09, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • November 09, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.