U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Espinal-Tejada et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 05, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 01, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 01, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sentencing]
January, 2018
  • January 28, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 29, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2017: [Waiver]
  • November 29, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 28, 2017: [Remark]
  • November 20, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • November 17, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.