U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Newell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Remark]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 25, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • May 20, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • January 10, 2022: [Reply to Response]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 03, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 17, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 16, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • September 08, 2021: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 28, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 22, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 09, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 25, 2021: [Rebuttal]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 19, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 17, 2021: [Response]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2021: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • January 07, 2021: [Reply to Response]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 08, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 29, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 09, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Transcript Request]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 30, 2019: [Remark]
  • January 29, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 29, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 29, 2019: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 08, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 18, 2018: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 08, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 10, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 10, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 23, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 09, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 30, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 30, 2018: [Defendant Severed from Codefendant(s)]
  • January 30, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 26, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 22, 2018: [Bill of Particulars]
  • January 03, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 02, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 20, 2017: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • December 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • December 14, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • December 14, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.