U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 29, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 19, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 23, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • January 10, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.