U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Writ of Certiorari Denied - Supreme Court]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • December 26, 2019: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • April 02, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • January 28, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 10, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 02, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • December 14, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 14, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 11, 2018: [Bill of Particulars]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 29, 2018: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 29, 2018: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • August 29, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 29, 2018: [Exhibit (Sealed) - Digital Audio File]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 27, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 17, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 16, 2018: [Response]
  • August 14, 2018: [Rebuttal]
  • August 13, 2018: [Response]
  • August 02, 2018: [Suppress]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [In Limine]
  • July 10, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 02, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 18, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 11, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.