U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Quinn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 04, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 03, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 29, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 18, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • May 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 16, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • February 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.