U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luckett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 07, 2018: [Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 24, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 13, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 08, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 28, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • February 06, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.