U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • January 06, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 22, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • October 16, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 14, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 04, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 19, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 22, 2018: [Bond]
  • May 22, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 18, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • May 10, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • February 06, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.