U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 15, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [In Limine]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • February 06, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.