U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pritchard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Subpoena Returned]
  • August 13, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 06, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • July 12, 2019: [Bond]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 12, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 02, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 30, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 16, 2018: [Suppress]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 27, 2018: [Competency Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • June 21, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
  • June 19, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 13, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • March 20, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 18, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2018: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 09, 2018: [Suppress]
  • March 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 02, 2018: [Remark]
  • March 01, 2018: [Status Conference]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • February 07, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • February 07, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.