U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 23, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 07, 2020: [Unseal Document]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 07, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 06, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 21, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 24, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 03, 2019: [Change of Address]
  • June 03, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 28, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 16, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2019: [Change of Address]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 11, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2019: [Letter]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2019: [Remark]
  • January 09, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 08, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 13, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 23, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 03, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 29, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • June 28, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 14, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • May 04, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • May 04, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • May 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 06, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 07, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [CJA Appointment Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.