U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barrios
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 28, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • September 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2018: [Subpoena Returned]
  • September 25, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2018: [Subpoena Returned]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 18, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • May 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 15, 2018: [Response]
  • May 14, 2018: [Response]
  • May 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 11, 2018: [In Limine]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 18, 2018: [Rebuttal]
  • March 17, 2018: [Discovery]
  • March 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2018: [In Limine]
  • March 15, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 13, 2018: [Suppress]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 06, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 05, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 05, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • February 07, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • February 07, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.