U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pecina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 20, 2018: [Remark]
  • August 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 02, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • February 07, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • February 07, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.