U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Minor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Change of Address]
  • February 14, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 26, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 19, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 16, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 01, 2019: [Remark]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 16, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 16, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • November 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 26, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • February 07, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • February 07, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.