U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Super
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 10, 2018: [Letter]
  • May 10, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 13, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 13, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 13, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 13, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 13, 2018: [Bond]
  • February 13, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 13, 2018: [Waiver]
  • February 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • February 09, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.