U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parnell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 17, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • June 12, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 17, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 22, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 22, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • May 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • February 14, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.