U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 18, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 18, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 18, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 18, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 13, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • July 11, 2018: [Subpoena Returned]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 09, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 08, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 20, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 17, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.