U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00076-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Kitto et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Remark]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 25, 2022: [Quash]
  • March 25, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 17, 2022: [Quash]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 16, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 14, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 08, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 07, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Writ Issued]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 21, 2018: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.