U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pixley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 18, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 25, 2019: [Dismiss]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 02, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 20, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Restricted Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 11, 2018: [Restricted Motion]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 08, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 22, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • February 22, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • February 22, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.