U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bradley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • January 22, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • January 16, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • January 10, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • June 12, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 12, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 12, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Change of Address]
  • April 12, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 12, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 16, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • October 16, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 16, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 16, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 15, 2018: [Bond]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 15, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • October 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.