U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Preston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • July 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 18, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 27, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.