U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clements
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 18, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • May 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • April 26, 2018: [Bond]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • April 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.