U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Legra-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 07, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 28, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 15, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • March 08, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • March 08, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.