U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • January 21, 2021: [Judgment - 2255]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 19, 2021: [Remark]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
  • April 17, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Transcript Request]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 20, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 18, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 24, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • September 24, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • September 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • September 18, 2018: [In Limine]
  • September 18, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 14, 2018: [Suppress]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 24, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 24, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 02, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 23, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 16, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 14, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.