U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bush
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 30, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 05, 2018: [Bond]
  • April 05, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 05, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.